555 Auto Group Inc.
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Margaret M Mann |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-07750 |
Case Filed: | Dec 25, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Debtor
555 Auto Group Inc.
PO Box 2463
Del Mar, CA 92014-1763 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Leonard J. Ackerman
6977 Navajo Road, Suite 124
San Diego, CA 92119 |
|
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 12/27/2016 12:01 AM PST |
Sunday, December 25, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) external
Sun 12/25 9:48 PM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 335.00. Declaration re: ECF due by 01/9/2017, Filed by Vikrant Chaudhry of VC Law Group, LLP on behalf of 555 Auto Group Inc.. (Chaudhry, Vikrant) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Sun 12/25 9:50 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 16-07750 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 335.00 Receipt number A12855136 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)
Sun 12/25 9:51 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Vikrant Chaudhry on behalf of 555 Auto Group Inc.. (Chaudhry, Vikrant) |
|
4 | 4
CASBApi
CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS)
Sun 12/25 9:51 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Leonard J. Ackerman, 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/25/2017 at 08:00 AM at 402 W. Broadway, Emerald Plaza Building, Suite 660 (A), Hearing Room A, San Diego, CA 92101 (Ch7). (Chaudhry, Vikrant) |