California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:16-bk-26820
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
SK Vision LLC
3608 Angelus Ave
Glendale, CA 91208-1225
Represented By
Aurora Talavera
Allied Legal Group Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
19 19 court Hearing Set(Motion) Tue 11:51 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/7/2017 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 1675, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Robert N. Kwan (Bakchellian, Mary)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor GRANDLAND INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Saturday, January 14, 2017
18 18 motion Relief - Real Property (motion) Sat 10:21 AM
Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 4343 Vista Place, La Canada, California 91011 . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor GRANDLAND INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Bach, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Legal Description
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 10:22 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property(2:16-bk-26820-RK) [motion,nmrp] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44044274. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#18
Thursday, January 05, 2017
17 17 misc Proof of service Thu 4:46 PM
Proof of service of "Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference" Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion X - Application (Generic) (motion) Thu 4:43 PM
Application to employ Aurora Talavera as Bankruptcy Counsel and Declaration of Aurora Talavera in support thereof Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Declaration Thu 4:37 PM
Declaration re: Aurora Talavera In support of Application by Debtor in Possession to employ Aurora Talavera as Chapter 11 bankruptcy counsel Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Thu 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $22.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20214840. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
14 14 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 12:58 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Bach, Julian. (Bach, Julian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 31, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 12/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Thursday, December 29, 2016
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Thu 4:53 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/31/2017 at 02:15 PM at RM 5, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
10 10 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 3:30 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Khojayan, Vahe. (Khojayan, Vahe)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 2:44 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status conference hearing to be held on 2/15/2017 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1675, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Robert N. Kwan (Bakchellian, Mary)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 2:38 PM
Order setting scheduling and case management conference. Hearing set on 2/15/2017 at 11:00 A.M., in Courtroom 1675. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/29/2016 Related [+]. (Bakchellian, Mary)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC
7 7 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 12:03 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect event code was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT EVENT and FILE THE DEBN REQUEST SEPARATELY. Related [+] (Gomez, Andrea)
Related: [-] 6 Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
6 6 misc Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Tue 11:54 AM
Schedule A/B for Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Schedules D, E/F, G, H, Stmt of Financial Affairs, Disc of Compensation,, List of Equity Sec Holders, Corp Ownership Stmt and Request to Activate Electronic Noticing Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Tue 11:44 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1) Tue 11:43 AM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals (Chapter 11) (Official Form 201A) Tue 11:41 AM
Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Under Chapter 11 (Official Form 201A) (New 12/2015) Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi Tue 11:39 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) Filed by Debtor SK Vision LLC. (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 11:35 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by SK Vision LLC (Talavera, Aurora)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 11:58 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:16-bk-26820) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43939080. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1