California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:16-bk-13619
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 27, 2017

Debtor
Kananpars Inc
6953 Calvin Ave
Reseda, CA 91335-3727
Represented By
Kananpars Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Amy L Goldman (TR)
633 W 5th Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/27/2016 12:01 PM PST
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 9:15 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Kananpars Inc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/10/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/10/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/10/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/10/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/10/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/10/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 1/10/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/10/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/10/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/10/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/10/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/10/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/10/2017. (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Tue 9:17 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/27/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-]