Wilson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph R Goodwin |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-12538 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/07 4:50 PM
ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/03 2:01 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE/ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/3/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation Of Dismissal
Thu 06/22 3:49 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Betty Wilson, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kassan, Randi) (Modified on 6/22/2017 to add party filers) (skh) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Thu 02/09 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Pretrial Order 246 - ETHICON MDL MEMBER CASE ONLY
Wed 12/28 12:08 PM
TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 246 (Order Amending PTO # 40 - Plaintiff Fact Sheet) entered on 12/09/2016 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jk) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/27 1:47 PM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5204175. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh) |