Cafe V, LLC
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Roger L Efremsky |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-43517 |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Debtor
Cafe V, LLC
2056 San Pablo Ave
Berkeley, CA 94702-1614 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Paul Mansdorf
1569 Solano Ave. #703
Berkeley, CA 94707 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 12/28/2016 12:02 AM PST |
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/27 3:34 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-43517 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27052384, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Tue 12/27 3:35 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/01/2017 at 10:00 AM at Oakland U.S. Trustee Office. (Smith, Arlo) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 12/27 3:31 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Cafe V, LLC. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 01/10/2017. (Smith, Arlo) |
|
Att: 1 Schedules - Summary.part of A.B | ||
Att: 2 Schedules A.b.pt2 + D | ||
Att: 3 Schedules.e to h + declaration | ||
Att: 4 St.fin.aff.pt.1 | ||
Att: 5 St.fin.aff.pt.2 | ||
Att: 6 Creditor Matrix |