Truth in IT, Inc.
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Louise Decarl Adler |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-07771 |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Debtor
Truth in IT, Inc.
3624 Ocean Ranch Blvd
Oceanside, CA 92056-2669 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ronald E. Stadtmueller
10755 Scripps Poway Pkwy., #370
San Diego, CA 92131 |
|
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 12/28/2016 12:02 AM PST |
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) - case upload
Tue 12/27 2:45 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules A-J & Statement of Financial Affairs Fee Amount $ 335.00 filed by Craig E. Dwyer on behalf of Truth in IT, Inc.. Declaration re: ECF due by 1/10/2017, (Dwyer, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)
Tue 12/27 2:45 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Craig E. Dwyer on behalf of Truth in IT, Inc.. (Dwyer, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
CASBApi
CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS)
Tue 12/27 2:45 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Ronald E. Stadtmueller, 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/26/2017 at 08:00 AM at 402 W. Broadway, Emerald Plaza Building, Suite 660 (A), Hearing Room A, San Diego, CA 92101 (Ch7). (Dwyer, Craig) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Tue 12/27 2:53 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 16-07771 7] ) [misc,1027u] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 335.00 Receipt number A12857465 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Miscellaneous (Document/Notice)
Tue 12/27 3:02 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Craig E. Dwyer on behalf of Truth in IT, Inc.. (Dwyer, Craig) |