DKIEL GROUP LLC
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher B Latham |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-07778 |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2016 |
Dismissed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Debtor
DKIEL GROUP LLC
PO Box 212945
Chula Vista, CA 91921-2945 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 12/28/2016 12:03 AM PST |
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) external
Tue 12/27 7:04 PM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 335.00. Schedules A-J due 01/10/2017. State. of Fin. Affairs due 01/10/2017. Summary of schedules due 01/10/2017. Credit Counseling Due Date: 01/10/2017. Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) Due: 01/10/2017. Means Test Exemption (122A-1Supp) Due: 01/10/2017. Means Test Calculation Form (122A-2) Due:01/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/10/2017, Declaration re: ECF due by 01/10/2017, Filed by Allan Cate of Cate Legal Group on behalf of DKIEL GROUP LLC. (Cate, Allan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)
Tue 12/27 7:06 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Allan Cate on behalf of DKIEL GROUP LLC. (Cate, Allan) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Tue 12/27 8:24 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 16-07778 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 335.00 Receipt number A12858260 ; (U.S. Treasury) |