California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Neil W Bason
Case #: 2:16-bk-26848
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 07, 2017

Debtor
SBJT, Inc.
353 Main St
El Segundo, CA 90245-3814
Represented By
Travis G Kasper
Kasper Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 840 Apollo Street, Suite 351
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/28/2016 12:02 AM PST
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 5:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26848) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43942725. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Tue 5:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Kasper, Travis)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 5:49 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by SBJT, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/10/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/10/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/10/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/10/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/10/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/10/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/10/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/10/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/10/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/10/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/10/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/10/2017. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 01/10/2017. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 01/10/2017. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 01/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/10/2017. (Kasper, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Electronic Signature Declaration
Att: 2 Atty Disclosure
Att: 3 Master Creditor Verification