TSI Group GP, LLC
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Ashely M Chan |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-18838 |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Debtor
TSI Group GP, LLC
1532 McDaniel Dr
West Chester, PA 19380-7034 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Docket last updated: 12/29/2016 12:03 AM EST |
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 12/28 7:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7) 16-18838 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18229044. Fee Amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 12/28 7:00 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by TSI Group GP, LLC. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 06/26/2017. (SMITH, DAVID) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Matrix
Wed 12/28 7:00 PM
Matrix Filed. Number of pages filed: 2, Filed by DAVID B. SMITH on behalf of TSI Group GP, LLC. (SMITH, DAVID) |