California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:16-bk-26889
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 07, 2017

Debtor
Preux & Proper, Inc.
777 E 10th St Ste 313
Los Angeles, CA 90021-2099
Represented By
Young K Chang
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 840 Apollo Street, Suite 351
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/29/2016 12:02 AM PST
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 12:09 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26889) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43946947. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 12:08 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Preux & Proper, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/11/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/11/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/11/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/11/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/11/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/11/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/11/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/11/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/11/2017. (Chang, Young) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #4. Debtor is not required to file: Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) Modified on 12/28/2016 (Beauchamp (Cheek), Sonia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 12:08 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Preux & Proper, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Wed 1:08 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Preux & Proper, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 2:04 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. DEBTOR IS NOT REQUIRED TO FILE: Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1)THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (Beauchamp (Cheek), Sonia)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Preux & Proper, Inc.
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Wed 12:09 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]