California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:16-bk-26890
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 07, 2017

Debtor
Milal, Inc.
3064 W 8th St
Los Angeles, CA 90005-1814
Represented By
Young K Chang
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 840 Apollo Street, Suite 351
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/29/2016 12:01 AM PST
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 12:16 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26890) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43947068. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Wed 3:32 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/11/2017. (Vandensteen, Nancy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Milal, Inc.
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 12:10 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Milal, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/11/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/11/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/11/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/11/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/11/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/11/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/11/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/11/2017. (Chang, Young)Warning: Also deficient: Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/11/2017. Modified on 12/28/2016 (Vandensteen, Nancy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 12:10 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Milal, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Wed 12:19 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Milal, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Wed 12:16 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc To comply BK Rule 1007/3015(b) - Ch 7/13 (manual - deforco) (BNC) Wed 3:34 PM
ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) Related [+] (Vandensteen, Nancy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Milal, Inc.