California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:16-bk-21228
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 31, 2017

Debtor
Upstar USA Group
209 Oldenburg Ln
Norco, CA 92860-3955
Represented By
Todd L Turoci
The Turoci Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Howard B Grobstein (TR)
Grobstein Teeple 3403 10th Street, Suite 711
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 12/29/2016 12:02 AM PST
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 3:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:16-bk-21228) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43949366. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 3:08 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Upstar USA Group (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 3:09 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Upstar USA Group. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Wed 3:35 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Upstar USA Group. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Wed 3:22 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/31/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]