Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan N Feeney
Case #: 1:16-ap-01200
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
John F Casey
Represented By
John F Casey
contact info
Defendant
Casey Summit, LLC
Represented By
Casey Summit, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Laser Leasing, Inc. d/b/a Aesthetic Laser Exchange
Represented By
Laser Leasing, Inc. d/b/a Aesthetic Laser Exchange
contact info
Defendant
Gayle Casey
Represented By
Gayle Casey
contact info
Defendant
Aesthetic Medical Lasers, LLC
Represented By
Aesthetic Medical Lasers, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary W. Cruickshank
Office of Gary W. Cruickshank One International Place Suite 701
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Kathleen R. Cruickshank
Murphy & King P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2017 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, March 27, 2017
164 164 cmp Third-Party Complaint Mon 12:55 PM
Third-Party Complaint by John F Casey against Sportserve, LLC; Mark Perrone; Tony Cotman; NZR Consulting, Inc.; Michael Morris; Outside In Advisors, LLC; Party By Design Inc.; Interstate Rental Service Inc.; DS Consulting, LLC; Blue Front Telecom Group, LLC; Dan Passacantilli; Chris Keohan; CK Strategies, LLC; George R. Roberts Co.; Jana Watt; Elizabeth Clifford; Kenneth Ryan; Charles Legeman; Fundraise.com, Inc.; Indycar LLC; and James Freudenberg. (lkaine, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
163 163 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 160 Order on Motion for Judgment
162 162 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 159 Order on Motion for Judgment
161 161 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 158 Order on Motion for Judgment
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
160 160 order Order on Motion for Judgment Tue 1:36 PM
Judgment dated 3/21/2017 Against Laser Leasing Inc. See Order for Full Text. (lkaine, Usbc)
Related: [-]
159 159 order Order on Motion for Judgment Tue 1:35 PM
Judgment dated 3/21/2017 Against Casey Summit LLC. See Order for Full Text. (lkaine, Usbc)
Related: [-]
158 158 order Order on Motion for Judgment Tue 1:33 PM
Judgment dated 3/21/2017 Against Gayle Casey. See Order for Full Text. (lkaine, Usbc)
Related: [-]