2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liabili
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine E Bauer |
Case #: | 8:16-bk-15243 |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
3991 MacArthur Blvd Ste 125
Newport Beach, CA 92660-3049 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
Wed 11/22 11:58 AM
Transcript Order Form , regarding Hearing Date 1/22/17 Filed by Interested Party Nathan Layne . ORDER NOT PROCESSED - No hearing held on this date. Referred ordering party of Order 17-CB-08 for a copy of transcript. (Le, James) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 03/01 10:34 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Wed 02/22 3:20 PM
Hearing Held RE Application to employ Goe & Forsythe, LLP - OFF CALENDAR; ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY ENTERED 2/13/17 (RE related document14 ) (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
35 | 35
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Wed 02/22 3:19 PM
Hearing Held RE Motion of Genesis Capital for order dismissing Chapter 11 Case and granting relief - OFF CALENDAR; ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY ENTERED 2/13/17 (RE related document21 ) (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
34 | 34
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Wed 02/22 3:18 PM
Hearing Held on Motion for Relief - OFF CALENDAR; ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY ENTERED 2/13/17 (RE related document20 ) (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
33 | 33
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 02/22 3:17 PM
Hearing Held RE Scheduling and Case Management Conference - OFF CALENDAR; ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY ENTERED 2/13/17(RE related document1 ) (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 02/15 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 02/15 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 02/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Wed 02/15 9:31 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20216141. (admin) |
||
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Wed 02/15 9:31 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $1.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20216141. (admin) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
misc
Notice of dismissal (BNC)
Mon 02/13 5:58 PM
Notice of dismissal (BNC) (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF)
Mon 02/13 5:58 PM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Bankruptcy - (BNC-PDF). Signed on 2/13/2017 |
|
28 | 28
6
pgs
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Mon 02/13 1:15 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
answer
Response
Wed 02/08 12:41 PM
Response to Filed by Creditor RS Lending, Inc. (Fitzgerald, Donald) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
6
pgs
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Tue 02/07 4:14 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Thu 02/02 12:35 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
24 | 24
4
pgs
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 02/02 10:43 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Thu 02/02 9:14 AM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
22 | 22
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Thu 02/02 9:14 AM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
21 | 21
97
pgs
motion
X - Motion (Generic) (motion)
Wed 02/01 9:59 PM
Motion Notice of Motion and Motion of Genesis Capital for Relief from Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. Section 362 or Alternatively, Motion for Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case If and to the Extent Not Previously Dismissed, and Granting Related Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of John Day and Jeffrey W. Dulberg in Support Thereof Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC (Dulberg, Jeffrey) |
|
20 | 20
139
pgs
motion
X - Relief from Stay (Generic) (motion)
Wed 02/01 9:28 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. Section 362 (with supporting declarations)(REAL PROPERTY) . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC (Dulberg, Jeffrey) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 02/01 9:30 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(8:16-bk-15243-CB) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44153583. Fee amount 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
answer
Opposition
Thu 01/26 7:02 PM
Opposition to LIMITED OBJECTION OF U.S. TRUSTEE TO DEBTORS APPLICATION TO EMPLOY GOE & FORSYTHE, LLP AS GENERAL BANKRUPTCY COUNSEL Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) (Hauser, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
court
Transcript
Thu 01/26 2:22 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/11/17 RE: Scheduling and Case Management Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 04/26/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/2/2017. Redaction Request Due By 02/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 02/27/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/26/2017. (Bauer, Tara) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Transcript Record Transmittal
Wed 01/25 12:22 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 17-CB-08. RE Hearing Date: 01/11/17, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO REPORTING, Telephone number 858-453-7590.] (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
Tue 01/24 2:05 PM
Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 01/11/17 Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC . (Dulberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of motion/application
Fri 01/20 2:56 PM
Notice of motion/application with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
14 | 14
12
pgs
motion
Employ (motion)
Fri 01/20 2:55 PM
Application to Employ Marc C. Forsythe and Goe & Forsythe, LLP as Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Fri 01/13 12:16 PM
Hearing Held - CASE DISMISSED; Order by attorney (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
misc
Statement
Mon 01/09 3:48 PM
Statement Genesis Capital's Reservation of Rights, Request for Order to Show Cause and Response to Debtor's Scheduling and Case Management Report Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC. (Dulberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 01/05 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
misc
Status report
Wed 01/04 4:04 PM
Status report with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Thu 01/05 9:46 AM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 08. Receipt Number 80067812. (admin) |
||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
8
pgs
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 01/03 1:36 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Scheduling and Case Management Conference with proof of service Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
8 | 8
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Tue 01/03 12:22 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Tue 01/03 12:21 PM
Order setting scheduling and case management conference - Status Conference set for 1/11/2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/3/2017 (Firman, Karen) |
|
Saturday, December 31, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 12/31 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/31/2016. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 12/31 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/31/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
misc
Request for special notice
Fri 12/30 10:01 AM
Request for special notice Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC. (Dulberg, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Fri 12/30 9:49 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Dulberg, Jeffrey. (Dulberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 12/29 3:55 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 12/29 3:54 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by 2401 Nottingham, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company List of Equity Security Holders due 01/12/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/12/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/12/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/12/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/12/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/12/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/12/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/12/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/12/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 01/12/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 01/12/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/12/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/12/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/12/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/12/2017. (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 12/29 3:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:16-bk-15243) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43957500. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |