GRW Trucking LLC
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Melvin S Hoffman |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-14859 |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 08, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jan 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Debtor
GRW Trucking LLC
5 Atwood Ave
Norwood, MA 02062-4101 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
Harold B. Murphy
Murphy & King, P.C. One Beacon Street
Boston, MA 02108 |
Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 12:02 AM EST |
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b (Use for AutoAssign Only)
Thu 12/29 9:47 AM
Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 02/07/2017 at 09:00 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House. (nr) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (Asset)
Thu 12/29 10:09 AM
Corrected Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/7/2017 at 09:00 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House, Boston, MA. Proofs of Claims due by 5/8/2017. (sas) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 12/29 9:47 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filed by GRW Trucking LLC. (nr) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order to Update
Thu 12/29 9:55 AM
Order to Update Re:1 Matrix ,Corporate Vote ,Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule 1007(a)(1) ,Initial Payment ,Due 1/5/2017. Pro Se Telephone due by 1/3/2017. Schedules A-H ,Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/12/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/12/2017. (nr) |
|
3 | 3
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Thu 12/29 9:59 AM
Court Certificate of Mailing. (nr) |