California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:16-bk-26963
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 07, 2017

Debtor
Sunset Thunderbowl LLC,a Nevada Limited Liability Company
PO Box 03038486
Sioux Falls, SD 57186
Represented By
Eugene S Fu
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 840 Apollo Street, Suite 351
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 12:03 AM PST
Thursday, December 29, 2016
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Thu 9:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 19. Receipt Number 20214676. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 2:27 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Sunset Thunderbowl LLC,a Nevada Limited Liability Company Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/12/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/12/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/12/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/12/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/12/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/12/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/12/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/12/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/12/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/12/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 1/12/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/12/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/12/2017. (Serrano, Vera) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2016 (Serrano, Vera)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Thu 2:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Serrano, Vera)
Related: [-]