Woodmill Recycling Company, Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | William J Lafferty |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-43547 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Debtor
Woodmill Recycling Company, Inc.
5595 Byron Hot Springs Rd
Byron, CA 94514-1601 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Paul Mansdorf
1569 Solano Ave. #703
Berkeley, CA 94707 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 12:03 PM PST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/30 11:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-43547 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27061875, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 12/30 11:36 AM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/01/2017 at 10:30 AM at Oakland U.S. Trustee Office. (Nyberg, Eric) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 12/30 11:35 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Woodmill Recycling Company, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 01/13/2017. (Nyberg, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Fri 12/30 11:35 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 10000 Filed by Debtor Woodmill Recycling Company, Inc. (Nyberg, Eric) |