California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:16-bk-27007
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017

Debtor
J.S.M. Heyri, Inc
755 S Hobart Blvd
Los Angeles, CA 90005-2823
Represented By
Jason John Kim
Law Offices Of Kim Au And Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John J Menchaca (TR)
835 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 300
Los Angeles, CA 90017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 12:03 PM PST
Friday, December 30, 2016
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 10:23 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 10:27 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-27007) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43961436. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 10:16 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by J.S.M. Heyri, Inc Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 01/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/13/2017. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Fri 10:22 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor J.S.M. Heyri, Inc. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Fri 10:23 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor J.S.M. Heyri, Inc. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]