Barnard Industries Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 6:16-bk-21278 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Debtor
Barnard Industries Inc.
44945 Camino Alamosa
Temecula, CA 92592-1410 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Howard B Grobstein (TR)
Grobstein Teeple 3403 10th Street, Suite 711
Riverside, CA 92501 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501 |
Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 12:02 PM PST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 12/30 10:08 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:16-bk-21278) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43961292. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Fri 12/30 10:08 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/31/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. (Saunders, Gary) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 12/30 9:52 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Barnard Industries Inc. (Saunders, Gary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Fri 12/30 9:54 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Barnard Industries Inc.. (Saunders, Gary) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 12/30 9:57 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Barnard Industries Inc.. (Saunders, Gary) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202)
Fri 12/30 10:03 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Filed by Debtor Barnard Industries Inc.. (Saunders, Gary) |