California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:16-bk-15251
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 07, 2017

Debtor
Fari Shady Canyon, LLC
50 Blue Heron
Irvine, CA 92603-0307
Represented By
Lisa L Fuller
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 12:03 PM PST
Friday, December 30, 2016
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 9:49 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Fari Shady Canyon, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/13/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/13/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/13/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/13/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/13/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/13/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/13/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/13/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/13/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/13/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/13/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 1/13/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 1/13/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/13/2017. (Law, Tamika)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 9:51 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Law, Tamika)
Related: [-]