Rock Commercial Enterprises, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:16-bk-26990 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2019 |
Debtor
Rock Commercial Enterprises, LLC
PO Box 190
Damascus, MD 20872-0190 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Michael G. Wolff
Goren, Wolff & Orenstein, LLC 15245 Shady Grove Rd. Suite 465, North Lobby
Rockville, MD 20850 |
Docket last updated: 12/30/2016 4:03 PM EST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7
Fri 12/30 3:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Michael G. Wolff, with 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
caseupld
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload
Fri 12/30 2:24 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Individual, Schedules A-J & Statement of Financial Affairs Fee Amount $ 335 filed by Kevin K. Shipe of Law Offices of Shipe & Bush, P.C. on behalf of Rock Commercial Enterprises, LLC. (Shipe, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/30 2:30 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload 16-26990 [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00). Receipt number 29870439. Fee amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Fri 12/30 2:33 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Kevin K. Shipe. (Shipe, Kevin) |