Consolidated Alloys, LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Wendy L Hagenau |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-73201 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Dismissed: | May 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Consolidated Alloys, LLC
3296 Summit Ridge Pkwy Ste 1510
Duluth, GA 30096-1626 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
misc
06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed
Fri 06/16 7:47 AM
Case Closed (cws) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order of Dismissal
Sat 05/27 1:35 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order of Dismissal Notice Date 05/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order Dismissing Case (PDF Order)
Wed 05/24 7:54 AM
Order Dismissing Case. Service by BNC Entered on 5/24/2017. (cws) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Operating Report
Mon 05/22 5:47 PM
Monthly Operating Report for: 03/01/17 through 03/31/17 filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Operating Report
Mon 05/22 5:47 PM
Monthly Operating Report for: 02/10/17 through 02/28/17 filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Brief
Mon 05/22 11:54 AM
Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Case, Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Sean A. Gordon on behalf of JAA Industrial Waste, Inc.. (Gordon, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Termination, Consolidated Alloys 7/21/16 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Consolidated Alloys, LLC Certificate of Organization 12/29/16 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - GA Sec. of State Entity/Control Number Search for Consolidated Alloys, LLC | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Debtor 30(b)(6), Steve Hong Depo. Tr. Excerpts and Cited Exhibits 4/17/17 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Cited Excerpt from Sec. 341 Mtg. Trasnscript | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Counsel Corresp. 4/19/17 and 5/11/17 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Counsel Corresp. 4/19/17, 5/17/17 and 5/19/17 | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Assume Executory Contract or Lease, Motion to
Fri 04/28 5:50 PM
Motion to Assume Executory Contract or Lease filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. Hearing to be held on 6/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice
Thu 04/27 1:38 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 04/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Order and Notice
Mon 04/24 10:21 AM
Order and Notice of Rescheduled Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion for Relief from Stay filed by JAA Industrial Waste, Inc. (Doc #14) and the Response thereto. Hearing to be held on 5/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta. Service by BNC. Entered on 4/24/2017. (smw) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (189)
Mon 04/24 1:27 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Rescheduling Hearing Notice Date 04/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/21 3:55 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing. Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 5/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (cre) |
|
misc
Hearing Held
Fri 04/21 9:03 AM
HEARING NOT HELD. Motion for Continuance Filed. Rescheduled hearing pending selection of alternate dates by parties. (cre) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continuance, Motion for
Wed 04/19 5:06 PM
Motion for Continuance filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Wed 04/19 11:25 AM
Conflict Letter For April 21,2017. (sfw) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)
Wed 04/05 2:51 PM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Thomas Wayne Dworschak on behalf of Guy G. Gebhardt. Hearing to be held on 4/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (Dworschak, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Accounts Receivable as Dec. 31, 2016 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Certificate of Termination, July 2016 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Certificate of Organization (Dec. 2016) | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice
Thu 03/09 1:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 03/08/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Order and Notice
Mon 03/06 11:34 AM
Order and Notice of assignment of evidentiary hearing. Service by BNC. Entered on 3/6/2017. Hearing to be held on 4/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (cws) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
misc
Hearing
Fri 03/03 7:18 AM
COURT NOTES: Rescheduled Hearing to be held on 4/21/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (cre) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Exhibits
Thu 03/02 12:18 PM
Exhibits Proof of Insurance filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Small Business Cash-Flow Statement
Thu 03/02 11:32 AM
Small Business Cash-Flow Statement filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Operating Report
Wed 03/01 4:45 PM
Operating Report January 2017 filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
18 | 18
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 03/01 4:44 PM
Certificate of Service on Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Response to Motion
Wed 03/01 12:03 AM
Response to Motion filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)
Wed 02/08 11:20 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case And Request for Status Conference filed by Thomas Wayne Dworschak on behalf of Guy G. Gebhardt. Hearing to be held on 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (Dworschak, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of No Appointment of Creditors' Committee
Tue 02/07 2:42 PM
The United States Trustee for Region 21 reports that no committee of creditors holding unsecured claims has been appointed in this case. Filed by Thomas Wayne Dworschak on behalf of Guy G. Gebhardt. (Dworschak, Thomas) |
||
misc
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded
Mon 02/13 12:36 PM
Section 341(a) meeting held and concluded (scm) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Tue 01/31 2:25 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay 16-73201 wlh) [motion,185] ( 181.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 43944653. Fee Amount 181.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
14 | 14
motion
00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)
Tue 01/31 2:23 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Bad Faith Filing or in the Alternative , Motion for Relief from Stay Fee $181, filed by Sean A. Gordon on behalf of JAA Industrial Waste, Inc.. Hearing to be held on 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta,Hearing to be held on 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1403, Atlanta, (Gordon, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Eviction Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Final Judgment for Possession | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Motion for Final Judgment | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Operating Report
Mon 01/23 4:18 PM
Operating Report December 2016 filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Income Statement | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Bank Statement | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
07-Application to Employ
Fri 01/13 5:41 PM
Application to Employ Tyler A. Moore as Attorney filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Affidavit of Tyler A. Moore | ||
11 | 11
misc
Small Business Federal Income Tax Return
Fri 01/13 5:13 PM
Small Business Federal Income Tax Return filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Small Business Statement of Operations
Fri 01/13 5:12 PM
Small Business Statement of Operations filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Fri 01/13 5:12 PM
Small Business Balance Sheet filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
8 | 8
misc
P-Attorney Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/13 4:49 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor , Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs , Attorney Disclosure Statement , Equity Security Holders filed by Tyler A. Moore on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. (Moore, Tyler) |
|
Saturday, January 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors
Sun 01/08 1:56 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 01/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency
Sat 01/07 2:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)
Thu 01/05 3:13 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11). 341 Meeting to be held on 2/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room 366, Atlanta. (asb) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - NON-INDIVIDUAL
Wed 01/04 1:19 PM
Notice of deadlines to correct filing deficiencies - Non-Individual. Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/13/2017. Schedule(s) due by 1/13/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 1/13/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/13/2017. Atty Disclosure State. due 1/13/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/13/2017. Tax Return Date: 1/6/2017. Balance Sheet Date: 1/6/2017.Statement of Operations Due 1/6/2017Cash Flow Statement due 1/6/2017 (cws) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/04 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Thomas Wayne Dworschak on behalf of Guy G. Gebhardt. (Dworschak, Thomas) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Fri 12/30 4:39 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-73201 [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 43687606. Fee Amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 12/30 4:21 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Fee $ 1717, Filed by Tyler A. Moore of Daniels & Taylor, P.C. on behalf of Consolidated Alloys, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 06/28/2017., Disclosure Statement due by 6/28/2017. (Moore, Tyler) |