Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Magdeline D Coleman
Case #: 2:16-bk-18931
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
North Philadelphia Health System, Debtor
801 W Girard Ave
Philadelphia, PA 19122-4212
Represented By
MARTIN J. WEIS
Dilworth Paxon LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107


1. North Philadelphia Health System enters bankruptcy (philly.com)
Submitted Thu 01/05/2017
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 6:02 PM EST
Friday, January 20, 2017
91 91 credact Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 3:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by PAUL J. WINTERHALTER Filed by PAUL J. WINTERHALTER on behalf of Community Behavioral Health. (WINTERHALTER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
90 90 order Employ Fri 3:35 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ of Dilworth Paxson LLP as Counsel for the Debtor Related [+] (C., Denine)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, January 19, 2017
89 89 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 11:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by RODNEY ALLEN MORRIS Filed by RODNEY ALLEN MORRIS on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (MORRIS, RODNEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
88 88 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice - Proposed Counsel for Patient Care Ombudsman by MARK B. CONLAN Filed by MARK B. CONLAN on behalf of David N. Crapo. (CONLAN, MARK)
Related: [-]
87 87 misc Praecipe to Withdraw Document Wed 2:21 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Application of Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Retention Nunc Pro Tunc to December 30, 2016 of Buzby & Kutzler, Attorneys at Law As Special Corporate and Conflicts Counsel Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(e) Filed by ANNE M. AARONSON on behalf of North Philadelphia Health System Related [+]. (AARONSON, ANNE)
Related: [-] 22
86 86 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 12:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by TOBEY M. DALUZ Filed by TOBEY M. DALUZ on behalf of Pennsylvania Department of Human Services. (DALUZ, TOBEY)
Related: [-]
85 85 misc Certificate of Service Wed 9:58 AM
Certificate of Service of Certification of No Objection Regarding Application to Employ Dilworth Paxson LLP as Counsel for Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession Filed by ANNE M. AARONSON on behalf of North Philadelphia Health System Related [+]. (AARONSON, ANNE)
Related: [-] 84
84 84 misc Certificate of No Response Wed 9:49 AM
Certificate of No Response to Application to Employ Dilworth Paxson LLP as Counsel for Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession Filed by ANNE M. AARONSON on behalf of North Philadelphia Health System Related [+]. (AARONSON, ANNE)
Related: [-] 2
Sunday, January 15, 2017
82 82 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 1:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #75 )
Saturday, January 14, 2017
81 81 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #73 )
80 80 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #71 )
Friday, January 13, 2017
83 83 notice Notice of Motion Tue 12:25 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Royal Bank America Leasing L.P. . Hearing scheduled 2/8/2017 at 11:00 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. (C., Denine)
Related: [-] 78 Motion to Compel Debtor to Assume or Reject Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 365
79 79 notice Notice of Motion Fri 7:18 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Royal Bank America Leasing L.P.. (GAGLIARDI, JOHN)
Related: [-] 78 Motion to Compel Debtor to Assume or Reject Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 365
Att: 1 Cert. of Service
78 78 motion Compel Fri 7:17 PM
Motion to Compel Debtor to Assume or Reject Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 365 Filed by Royal Bank America Leasing L.P. Represented by JOHN A. GAGLIARDI (Counsel). (GAGLIARDI, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Proposed Order
77 77 misc Certificate of Service Fri 4:16 PM
Certificate of Service Second Interim Order (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral of Existing Secured Parties and Granting Adequate Protection for Such Use and (B) Prescribing the Form and Manner of Notice and Setting the Time for a Final Hearing Filed by MARTIN J. WEIS on behalf of North Philadelphia Health System Related [+]. (WEIS, MARTIN)
Related: [-] 73
76 76 court Document Fri 12:07 PM
Notice of United States Trustee's Appointment of David N. Crapo as Health Care Ombudsman Filed by KEVIN P. CALLAHAN on behalf of United States Trustee Related [+]. (CALLAHAN, KEVIN)
Related: [-] 70
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
75 75 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 12:05 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Bonnie Y. Hochman Rothell is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice for Hunt Mortgage Group, as servicer for the Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, in the above matter conditioned upon payment of all required fees Related [+] (C., Denine)
Related: [-] 29