Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr
Case #: 1:16-cv-00299
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2016
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2017 3:33 AM CST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company 221 Bolivar Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
Ann E. Sternhell Blackwell
Thompson Coburn, LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Cox
Thompson Coburn, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey A. Masson
Thompson Coburn, LLP
contact info
John R. Musgrave
Thompson Coburn, LLP
contact info
Jan P. Miller
Thompson Coburn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bill Bader
40245 CR 101
Campbell, MO 63933
Represented By
Billy R. Randles
Randles And Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Angela Marie Splittgerber
Randles And Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Beverly Turina Randles
Randles And Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Bill R. Randles
Randles & Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bader Farms, Inc.
40245 CR 101
Campbell, MO 63933
Represented By
Billy R. Randles
Randles And Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Angela Marie Splittgerber
Randles And Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Beverly Turina Randles
Randles And Splittgerber, LLP
contact info
Bill R. Randles
Randles & Splittgerber, LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 16 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (#30) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/16/2017. (JMC)

1. Bader Farms lawsuit against Monsanto moved to federal court (dddnews.com)
Submitted Wed 01/04/2017
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 02, 2017
49 49 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 3:06 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
48 48 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 3:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
47 47 order A Docket Text Order Tue 4:19 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:45 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly) filed by Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/21/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
46 46 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Cox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion File in Excess of Page Limitation Tue 1:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
44 44 order Memorandum & Order Thu 3:00 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (#30) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/16/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
43 43 order A Docket Text Order Wed 2:26 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:41 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re21 Protective Order Joint Motion to Lift Protective Order by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Splittgerber, Angela) Modified on 2/8/2017 (JMC). filed by Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/8/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11:47 AM
NOTICE Related Case: by Defendant Monsanto Company (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Order (Miscellaneous Relief) Wed 11:35 AM
REPORT TO COURT ORDER re21 Protective Order Joint Motion to Lift Protective Order by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Splittgerber, Angela) Modified on 2/8/2017 (JMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
40 40 respm Surreply to Motion (Need Leave of Court) Thu 2:02 PM
SURREPLY to Motion re30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
39 39 order A Docket Text Order Mon 2:25 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:38 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Remand by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/30/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Leave to Mon 12:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Remand by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
37 37 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 3:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
36 36 order A Docket Text Order Fri 2:01 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:34 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/20/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 1:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion File in Excess of Page Limitation Fri 1:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Tue 3:32 PM
NOTICE Service of Discovery Responses: by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc. (Splittgerber, Angela)
Related: [-]
32 32 order A Docket Text Order Tue 10:19 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:29 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly) filed by Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/17/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
31 31 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 9:07 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re30 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Remand to State Court Fri 9:06 AM
MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Leave to Fri 9:04 AM
MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Fri 9:02 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
27 27 order A Docket Text Order Wed 2:37 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Beverly Turina Randles. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5758036) by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc..(Randles, Beverly) filed by Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/11/17. (MRS)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Beverly Turina Randles. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5758036) by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc..(Randles, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
25 25 order A Docket Text Order Tue 2:28 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Angela Marie Splittgerber. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5755746) by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc..(Splittgerber, Angela) filed by Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/10/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
24 24 order A Docket Text Order Tue 2:27 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Billy R. Randles. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5755719) by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc..(Randles, Billy) filed by Bader Farms, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/10/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 1:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Angela Marie Splittgerber. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5755746) by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc..(Splittgerber, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 1:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Billy R. Randles. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5755719) by Plaintiff Bader Farms, Inc..(Randles, Billy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, January 09, 2017
21 21 order Protective Order Mon 3:47 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/9/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
20 20 order A Docket Text Order Mon 3:46 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:10 MOTION for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery and Entry of a Protective Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Cox, Daniel) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED, there being no objection thereto. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/9/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10:46 AM
NOTICE Compliance with Court's January 6, 2016 Order and Request for Discovery Order: by Defendant Monsanto Company re 18 Docket Text Order,, (Cox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 3:47 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 21. Mon Jan 9 15:47:51 CST 2017 (Carter, Jessica)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 3:50 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Mon Jan 9 15:50:26 CST 2017 (Carter, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
18 18 order A Docket Text Order Fri 12:06 PM
Docket Text ORDER: - ORDERED Conference call held with Court and counsel for all parties participating. Counsel agrees to consult with each other this day to resolve any disputes concerning defendant's request for expedited discovery and report back to the Court as soon as possible. In the event that plaintiffs file a motion for remand to state court, this Court will stay briefing on defendant's motion to dismiss until after resolution of the motion for remand. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/6/2017. (JMC)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 12:06 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 18. Fri Jan 6 12:06:24 CST 2017 (Carter, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
17 17 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,10 MOTION for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery and Entry of a Protective Order as to Expedited Discovery filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Cox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 1:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,10 MOTION for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery and Entry of a Protective Order by Plaintiffs Bill Bader, Bader Farms, Inc.. (JMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Fri 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 4:22 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jan P. Miller for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Miller, Jan)
Related: [-]
13 13 order A Docket Text Order Fri 4:21 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:8 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/30/16. (CSG)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 2:58 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Masson for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Masson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 2:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re10 MOTION for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery and Entry of a Protective Order filed by Defendant Monsanto Company.(Cox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Discovery,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Ex. 2 - Proposed Order
10 10 motion Leave to Fri 2:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery and Entry of a Protective Order by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Cox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 2:43 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel C. Cox for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Cox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion File in Excess of Page Limitation Fri 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 2:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Monsanto Company.(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
6 6 motion Dismiss Case Fri 2:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 1:38 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by John R. Musgrave for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Musgrave, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Fri 1:15 PM
Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court of Dunklin County, Missouri, filed by Bader Farms, Inc., Bill Bader.(JMC)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
3 3 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Fri 11:39 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Monsanto Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: See attached, Publicly held company: None,. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Fri 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: Plaintiff(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Removal
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Fri 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dunklin County Circuit Court, case number 16DU-CC00111, with receipt number 0865-5742897, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Monsanto Company.(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Case File,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 1:19 PM
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JMC)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 4:21 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 13. Fri Dec 30 16:21:48 CST 2016 (Gould, Cathy)
Related: [-]