Charick v. Account Services Collections, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Schell |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00986 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 28, 2017 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Account Services Collections, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candice Charick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 05/26 8:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re10 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Candice Charick. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/25/17. (cm, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 05/23 11:29 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Candice Charick.(DeFrancisco, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/11 8:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2017. Discovery due by 9/1/2017. Expert Witness List due by 5/18/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 5/2/2017. Mediation Completion due by 7/21/2017. Designation of Mediator due by 5/26/2017, Motions due by 9/6/2017. Motions in Limine due by 10/20/17. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/10/17. (cm, ) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 04/06 11:56 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(DeFrancisco, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/28 10:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candice Charick. Account Services Collections, Inc. served on 1/6/2017, answer due 1/27/2017. (baf, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/22 11:40 AM
ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/6/2017.). Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/22/17. (cm, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/21 1:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Account Services Collections, Inc..(Wier, William) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/30 12:25 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Account Services Collections, Inc. (kls, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE by Candice Charick (DeFrancisco, Jenny) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 12/30 11:02 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Candice Charick. (DeFrancisco, Jenny) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/30 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Account Services Collections, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6091183.), filed by Candice Charick.(DeFrancisco, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 12/30 12:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard A. Schell. (kls, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 12/30 12:25 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (kls, ) |