Killian Communication Corporation
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Peter Carroll |
Case #: | 9:16-bk-12421 |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Debtor
Killian Communication Corporation
265 South St Ste E
San Luis Obispo, CA 93401-5036 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jerry Namba (TR)
504 East Chapel Street
Santa Maria, CA 93454 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 12/31/2016 12:02 AM PST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 12/30 1:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:16-bk-12421) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43963015. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 12/30 1:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Killian Communication Corporation (Tos, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Petition 2 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Fri 12/30 1:09 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Killian Communication Corporation. (Tos, Leslie) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Fri 12/30 1:13 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/13/2017 at 09:00 AM at 128 E Carrillo St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Tos, Leslie) |