New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 1:16-bk-13625
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.
200 South St Ste 4
Morristown, NJ 07960-5370
Represented By
Tracy L. Klestadt
Klestadt Winters Jureller
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


1. Transmar's U.S. cocoa unit files for bankruptcy (reuters.com)
Submitted Thu 01/05/2017
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
142 142 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 4:34 PM
Affidavit of Service of Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for February 22, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 137
Monday, February 20, 2017
141 141 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 7:02 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.. (Corneau, Joseph)
Related: [-]
140 140 misc Schedules Mon 7:01 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.. (Corneau, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
139 139 order Motion, Relief from Stay (fee) Fri 2:52 PM
Consent Order signed on 2/17/2017 between the Debtor and Swiss Trading Solutions LTD Re: Motion for Relief from Stay. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 42
138 138 answer Statement Fri 12:00 PM
Statement - Supplement to Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Peretti LLP as Lead Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(a) Related [+] filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.. (Corneau, Joseph)
Related: [-] 97
Thursday, February 16, 2017
137 137 notice Notice, Agenda Thu 1:57 PM
Notice of Agenda - Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for February 22, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+] filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JLG) (Corneau, Joseph)
Related: [-] 98 ,97 ,118 ,99 ,100 ,101 ,127 ,41 ,10 ,96
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
136 136 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 6:55 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Filing of Exhibits to Debtors Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Gorg as Special Counsel to the Debtor And Debtor-in-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(e) Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 133
135 135 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 5:05 PM
Affidavit of Service of Final Order Authorizing the Retention and Appointment of Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. as Claims and Noticing Agent Under 28 U.S.C. 156(c), 11 U.S.C. 105(a), And S.D.N.Y. LBR 5075-1 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 111
134 134 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 5:04 PM
Affidavit of Service of Final Order Authorizing Debtor to (I) Pay All Pre-Petition Insurance Premiums (II) Continue Pre-Petition Insurance Policies and Programs and (III) Perform All Pre-Petition Obligations with Respect Thereto Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 110
133 133 answer Statement Wed 5:03 PM
Statement - Notice of Filing of Exhibits to Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of GORG Partnerschaft von Rechtsanwlten mbB as Special Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(e) Related [+] filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.. (Corneau, Joseph)
Related: [-] 98
132 132 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 5:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Final Order: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Satisfy and, to the Extent Applicable, Directing any Payroll Banks to Honor, Prepetition Employee Compensation Obligations, and (B) Honor, in its Discretion, Pre-Petition Paid Time off and Similar Themed Days; and (II) Authorizing the Debtor to Continue Paying and/or Otherwise Honoring All Other Employee Benefits Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 109
131 131 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 4:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Final Order Authorizing, but Not Directing, the Debtor to Pay Prepetition Claims of Logistics Service Providers, Warehousemen, Melters and Related Obligations Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 108
130 130 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 4:54 PM
Affidavit of Service of (i) Second Interim Order Authorizing the Debtor to (I) Continue to Use Existing Cash Management System; (II) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms; and (III) Waive Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b); and (ii) Stipulation and Final Agreed Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 361, 362 and 363 and Rules 4001(b), 4001(d) and 9014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (I) Authorizing Debtors Use of Cash Collateral and (II) Providing Adequate Protection Thereof Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 106 ,116
129 129 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 4:52 PM
Affidavit of Service of Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for February 8, 2017 at 11:00 A.M. Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 115
128 128 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 2:09 PM
Affidavit of Service of Supplement to Debtors Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti LLP as Lead Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession Related [+] filed by Donlin Recano & Company, Inc..(Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 127
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
127 127 motion Application, Employ Tue 4:25 PM
Application to Employ Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor - Supplement to Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Peretti LLP as Lead Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(a) Related [+] filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Transmar Commodity Group Ltd.. (Corneau, Joseph)
Related: [-] 97
126 126 order Order, Extending Time to File Schedules Tue 3:45 PM
Second Order signed on 2/14/2017 Extending Time to File Schedules. DEADLINE: 2/20/2017 Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 1 ,35
125 125 order ~Generic~ Order Tue 2:54 PM
Order signed on 2/14/2017 Authorizing ABN AMRO Capital USA LLC to issue Subpoenas to AMERRA Capital Management LLC for the production of documents. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 71
124 124 order ~Generic~ Order Tue 2:50 PM
Order signed on 2/14/2017 Authorizing ABN AMRO Capital USA LLC to issue subpoenas to the debtor and others for the production of documents and examination of witnesses. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 71
123 123 order ~Generic~ Order Tue 2:33 PM
Order signed on 2/14/2017 Authorizing ABN AMRO Capital USA LLC to issue subpoenas to the debtor and others for the production of documents and examination of witnesses. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 71