California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:17-bk-10002
Case Filed:Jan 01, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Rescue One Ambulance
15540 Texaco Ave
Paramount, CA 90723-3922
Represented By
Michael Jay Berger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
29 29 notice Notice Wed 5:22 PM
Notice of Setting/Increasing Insider Compensation Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 5:21 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Deficiencies and Status Report Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 nef Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 10:18 AM
Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Greene, Gavin. (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
26 26 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 10:01 AM
Notice to Filer PDF with interactive field(s) attached Other Other -The attorney has been contacted and has been requested to re-file the document(s) as a flat PDF (No interactive form fields) Related [+] (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-] 23 Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) filed by Creditor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
25 25 misc Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Tue 7:55 PM
Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance Related [+]. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
24 24 misc Status report Tue 6:45 PM
Status report Case Status Report Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance Related [+]. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
23 23 nef Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 2:31 PM
Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Greene, Gavin. (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jolene Tanner Filed by Creditor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Tanner, Jolene)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2017
21 21 misc Declaration Mon 6:09 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Andrew Boulos in Response to Judge's Tentative Ruling for January 17, 2017 Status Conference and Motion for an Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral for Payroll and Operating Expenses Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance Related [+]. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Debtor's Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral for Payroll and Operating Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Andrew Boulos in Support Thereof , Emergency motion Debtor's Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral for Payroll and Operating Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Andrew Boulos in Support Thereof
20 20 motion Employ (motion) Mon 2:26 PM
Application to Employ Michael Jay Berger as General Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 15, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 13, 2017
18 18 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 9:41 AM
Order Approving Stipulation for Use of Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2017 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, January 12, 2017
17 17 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10:46 AM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Creditor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE Related [+]. (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation By UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and Rescue One Ambulance Filed by Creditor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
16 16 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 10:38 AM
Stipulation By UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and Rescue One Ambulance Filed by Creditor UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on behalf of the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Greene, Gavin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
14 14 court Hearing Set(Motion) Wed 10:45 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
13 13 motion Emergency motion (motion) Tue 5:51 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Debtor's Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral for Payroll and Operating Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Andrew Boulos in Support Thereof , in addition to Emergency motion Debtor's Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral for Payroll and Operating Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Andrew Boulos in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Declaration Tue 4:34 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Peter Garza Regarding Service by United States Mail of the Order Setting Case Status Conference and Procedures Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance Related [+]. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 2:41 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - The actual motion is missing. The attorney should file the actual Motion for use of cash collateral immediately. Related [+] (Sumlin, Sharon E.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20215012. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 9:30 PM
Receipt of Forms - $3.50 by 03. Receipt Number 20215012. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 6:58 PM
Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral for Payroll and Operating Expenses Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 2:26 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 1/31/2017 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason Related [+] (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Rescue One Ambulance Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/17/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/17/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/17/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/17/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/17/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/17/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/17/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 2:24 PM
Order Setting Case Status Conference and Procedures (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/9/2017 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, January 08, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, January 06, 2017
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 3:27 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/6/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
court U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual) Tue 1:05 PM
Judge Neil W. Bason added to case due to prior case 16-12012NB (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Tue 1:12 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/17/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 1/17/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/17/2017. (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Tue 1:14 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/17/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/17/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/17/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/17/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/17/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/17/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/17/2017. (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance
Sunday, January 01, 2017
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Sun 8:48 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Sun 8:44 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Rescue One Ambulance. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 8:32 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Rescue One Ambulance Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/17/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/17/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/17/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/17/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/17/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/17/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/17/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 8:34 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:17-bk-10002) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43967529. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1