The Islamic Society of Basking, et al v. Township of Bernards, et al
Original Case: 3:16-cv-01369
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-04414 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 09, 2017 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF BERNARDS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
TOWNSHIP OF BERNARDS
|
Represented By
|
Not Party - Appellant
MICHAEL S. BARTH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
THE ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF BASKING RIDGE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MOHAMMAD ALI CHAUDRY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/09/2017 3:32 AM EST |
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Michael S. Barth in District Court No. 3-16-cv-01369. (SB) | ||
ORDER (Clerk) the all defendants shall hereinafter be referred to as Township of Bernards for docketing purposes. Counsel is directed to choose this party designation when filing electronically, filed. (SB) | ||
CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Michael S. Barth, received. (SB) | ||
Letter Memorandum. Certificate of Service dated 12/23/2016. Service made by US mail. (SB) |