B.C. Grand, LLC
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Grace Diehl |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-50094 |
Case Filed: | Jan 02, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Oct 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
B.C. Grand, LLC
44 Broad St NW Ste 400
Atlanta, GA 30303-2328 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
88 | 88
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Redact Personal Identifiers (FEE)
Thu 12/14 1:36 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Redact Personal Identifiers (FEE) Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
87 | 87
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Redact Personal Identifiers (Form Order)
Mon 12/11 3:35 PM
Order GRANTING Motion to Redact Personal Identifiers. Service by BNC. Entered on 12/11/2017. (slj) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
86 | 86
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Wed 12/06 2:01 PM
Receipt of Motion to Redact Personal Identifiers (FEE) 17-50094 mgd) [motion,mredact] ( 25.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 46618918. Fee Amount 25.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
85 | 85
motion
Redact Personal Identifiers (FEE), Motion to
Wed 12/06 1:55 PM
Motion to Redact Personal Identifiers Fee $ 25, filed by Marion B. Stokes on behalf of First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (Stokes, Marion) |
|
Att: 1 Revision Redacted Motion | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Motion Exhibits | ||
Att: 3 Revision Redacted Proposed Order | ||
Att: 4 Revision Redacted Proof of Claim |