Nathan's Easy Haul, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert N Kwan |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-27096 |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Debtor
Nathan's Easy Haul, Inc.
17642 Clark Ave
Bellflower, CA 90706-6521 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John J Menchaca (TR)
835 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 300
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/03/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Saturday, December 31, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sat 12/31 8:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-27096) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43966681. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Sat 12/31 8:19 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Nathan's Easy Haul, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/17/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/17/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/17/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/17/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/17/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/17/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/17/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017. (Polis, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Sat 12/31 8:19 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Nathan's Easy Haul, Inc.. (Polis, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Sat 12/31 8:25 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Nathan's Easy Haul, Inc.. (Polis, Thomas) |