California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter Carroll
Case #: 9:16-bk-12433
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017

Debtor
Autec Power Systems Inc.
667 Cochran St
Simi Valley, CA 93065-1939
Represented By
Andrew S Mansfield
Mansfield Law Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Sandra McBeth (TR)
2236 S. Broadway, Suite J
Santa Maria, CA 93454
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/03/2017 12:02 AM PST
Saturday, December 31, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 4:02 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:16-bk-12433) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43966553. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Sat 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 09:00 AM at 128 E Carrillo St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Mansfield, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sat 3:48 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Autec Power Systems Inc. (Mansfield, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Sat 3:48 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Autec Power Systems Inc.. (Mansfield, Andrew)
Related: [-]