DLK Development, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Peter Carroll |
Case #: | 9:16-bk-12434 |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Debtor
DLK Development, Inc.
20407 Seaboard Rd
Malibu, CA 90265-5349 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Sandra McBeth (TR)
2236 S. Broadway, Suite J
Santa Maria, CA 93454 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 01/03/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Saturday, December 31, 2016 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Sat 12/31 3:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 09:00 AM at 128 E Carrillo St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Jessee, Mark) |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sat 12/31 4:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:16-bk-12434) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43966594. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Sat 12/31 3:49 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by DLK Development, Inc. (Jessee, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Sat 12/31 3:50 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor DLK Development, Inc.. (Jessee, Mark) |