California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter Carroll
Case #: 9:16-bk-12436
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017

Debtor
By Linnea, Inc., Debtor
PO Box 155
Carpinteria, CA 93014-0155
Represented By
Andrew S Mansfield
Mansfield Law Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Sandra McBeth (TR)
2236 S. Broadway, Suite J
Santa Maria, CA 93454
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 01/03/2017 12:02 AM PST
Saturday, December 31, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 6:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:16-bk-12436) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43966654. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Sat 6:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 09:00 AM at 128 E Carrillo St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Mansfield, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sat 6:51 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by By Linnea, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/17/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/17/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/17/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/17/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/17/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/17/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017. (Mansfield, Andrew)
Related: [-]