Aamir Wahab DDS, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Julia W Brand |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10010 |
Case Filed: | Jan 02, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Debtor
Aamir Wahab DDS, Inc.
8500 Wilshire Blvd Ste 505
Beverly Hills, CA 90211-3111 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Edward M Wolkowitz (TR)
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP 800 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1260
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 03/05/2017 3:25 PM PST |
Monday, January 02, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 01/02 10:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10010) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43968504. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Mon 01/02 10:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Boice, Bruce) |
||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 01/02 10:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Aamir Wahab DDS, Inc. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 02/1/2017 (Boice, Bruce) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Mon 01/02 10:52 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Aamir Wahab DDS, Inc.. (Boice, Bruce) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Mon 01/02 11:51 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Aamir Wahab DDS, Inc.. (Boice, Bruce) |
|
4 | 4 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Boice, Bruce) |