Industrial Expeditors, LLC v. Yellowstone Capital LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-52144
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-52144
Mississippi Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Katharine M Samson |
Case #: | 6:17-ap-06001 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Yellowstone Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Industrial Expeditors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6.430
Jackson, MS 39201 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/30 1:27 PM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-6001 Closed (Cannette, Christy) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Dismissal Re: Complaint
Wed 06/14 8:25 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff Industrial Expeditors, LLC . (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Show Cause
Wed 05/31 11:21 AM
Order to Appear and Show Cause . Show Cause hearing to be held on 6/15/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom - Gulfport. (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 05/12 1:07 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Default Judgment Motion and Order due by 5/26/2017. (Cannette, Christy) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Default - Motion/Application for Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 05/12 10:21 AM
Motion /Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Plaintiff Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick A. Sheehan | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 04/28 9:55 AM
Notice of Deficiency - to file pleading Compliance due date: 5/12/2017. (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Vacate
Mon 04/10 11:11 AM
Order Granting Motion To Vacate (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing Set (KMS) Adversary
Fri 03/24 8:25 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing to be held on 4/13/2017 at 01:30 PM Courtroom - Gulfport for11 , Responses due by 4/6/2017. (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Vacate
Thu 03/23 10:30 AM
Motion to Vacate Filed by Plaintiff Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Reinstate Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/22 4:19 PM
Motion to Reinstate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/22 10:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 03/01 11:08 AM
Notice of Deficiency - to file pleading Compliance due date: 3/15/2017. (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 01/04 8:49 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-06001 KMS) ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8861185. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
utility
Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)
Wed 01/04 8:07 AM
Fee Due Complaint $ 350 (Derouen, Collette) |
||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/03 10:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on Yellowstone Capital LLC 1/3/2017 (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Envelope to Yellowstone thru its Registered Agent | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/03 10:36 AM
Summons Service Executed on Yellowstone Capital LLC 1/3/2017 (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Envelope to Yellowstone thru Attorney Serbro | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/03 10:34 AM
Summons Service Executed on Yellowstone Capital LLC 1/3/2017 (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Envelope to Yellowstone in NJ | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 01/03 9:39 AM
Summons Issued on Yellowstone Capital LLC Date Issued 1/3/2017, Answer Due 2/2/2017 (Cannette, Christy) |
|
Monday, January 02, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Adversary Cover Sheet (Form 1040)
Mon 01/02 3:01 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Filed by Plaintiff Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/02 3:01 PM
Adversary case 17-06001 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Patrick A. Sheehan on behalf of Industrial Expeditors, LLC against Yellowstone Capital LLC. Receipt Number exempt, Fee Amount $350 (Sheehan, Patrick) |