Michael B. Cline and Kimberly A. Cline
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:17-bk-80004
Lead case is: 2:17-bk-80004
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00013 |
Case Filed: | Jan 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Debtor
Michael B. Cline
10796 S. County Road 875 E
Ladoga, IN 47954 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Kimberly A. Cline
10796 S. County Road 875 E
Ladoga, IN 47954 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago |
Sunday, December 31, 2017 | ||
60 | 60
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Order
Mon 01/01 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 12/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
59 | 59
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Dismissal
Mon 01/01 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL . No. of Notices: 65 Notice Date 12/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
58 | 58
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/29 2:48 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (cmd) |
|
57 | 57
order
Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to
Fri 12/29 2:41 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case (member case 17-00013 JJG-11) . Notice of Entry of Dismissal issued to all creditors. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |