Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 2:17-bk-80004
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cline Grain, Inc.
12161 N County Road 650 E
Roachdale, IN 46172-9362
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Hester
Hester Baker Krebs LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
31 31 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Documents Wed 12:11 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Affairs Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. Incomplete Filings due by 2/2/2017. (jlh)
Related: [-] 30
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
30 30 motion Extend Time to File Initial Documents (Schedules, Plan, Pay Advices, Etc.), Motion to Tue 3:12 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Affairs filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Grain, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
29 29 notice Appearance Fri 1:53 PM
Appearance filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Creditor Indiana Soybean Alliance, Inc. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice Fri 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 MEETING NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 67 Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
27 27 notice Appearance Wed 4:19 PM
Appearance filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Creditor Indiana Corn Marketing Council. (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
26 26 notice Appearance Tue 11:47 AM
Appearance filed by W Randall Kammeyer on behalf of Creditor CNH Capital America, LLC. (Kammeyer, W)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Joint Administration, Order on Motion for Tue 10:37 AM
Order Granting Motion to Jointly Administer Member Case 2-17-bk-80006 under Lead Case 2:17-bk-80004 (order distributed to e-filers only). (lak)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Joint Administration, Order on Motion for Tue 10:36 AM
Order Granting Motion to Jointly Administer Member Case 2-17-bk-80005 under Lead Case 2:17-bk-80004 (order distributed to e-filers only). (lak)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Joint Administration, Order on Motion for Tue 10:35 AM
Order Granting Motion to Jointly Administer Member Case 1-17-bk-14 under Lead Case 2:17-bk-80004 (order distributed to e-filers only). (lak)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Joint Administration, Order on Motion for Tue 10:34 AM
Order Granting Motion to Jointly Administer Member Case 1-17-bk-13 under Lead Case 2:17-bk-80004 (order distributed to e-filers only). (lak)
Related: [-]
21 21 court 341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11 Tue 10:19 AM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 2/2/2017 at 01:00 PM EST in Rm 110 U.S. Courthouse, Terre Haute. Objections to Dischargeability due by 4/3/2017. (lad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
20 20 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 3:15 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims And Are Not Insiders filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Grain, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Minute Entry/Order Mon 2:37 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Hearing on Debtor's First Day Motion for Joint Administration. Hearing held. Court grants Debtor's Motion Related [+]. (hhd)
Related: [-] 9
18 18 notice Appearance Mon 2:29 PM
Appearance filed by Gary A. Barnes on behalf of Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance Mon 11:27 AM
Appearance filed by James E. Carlberg on behalf of Creditor First Farmers Bank & Trust. (Carlberg, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Mon 10:40 AM
Appearance filed by Weston Erick Overturf on behalf of Creditor First Farmers Bank & Trust. (Overturf, Weston)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion for Joint Administration, Hearing Notice, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Grain, Inc Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9 ,12
Thursday, January 05, 2017
12 12 notice Hearing Notice (must be reviewed & approved by Court before filing) Thu 3:43 PM
Notice of Hearing re: Motion for Joint Administration, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Grain, Inc Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Objections due by 01/09/2017. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 order Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Thu 11:36 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Attorney for Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company must distribute this order. (jlh)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear Wed 4:54 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Gary A. Barnes on behalf of Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Wed 4:20 PM
First Day Motion for Joint Administration of Cases 2:17-bk-80004, 2:17-bk-80005, 2:17-bk-80006, 1:17-bk-14 and 1:17-bk-13 filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Grain, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 3:34 PM
Appearance filed by Scott R Leisz on behalf of Creditor Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Leisz, Scott)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 3:28 PM
Appearance filed by Whitney L Mosby on behalf of Creditor Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Mosby, Whitney)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 11:19 AM
Appearance filed by Elizabeth Marie Little on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Little, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 10:37 AM
Appearance filed by Jay Jaffe on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Jaffe, Jay)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Wed 10:29 AM
Appearance filed by Kayla D. Britton on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Britton, Kayla)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Petition Wed 8:19 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued Related [+]. List of Equity Security Holders due by 01/17/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 7:35 AM
Appearance filed by Ronald J. Moore on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Moore, Ronald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 4:56 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-80004 JJG-11) [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26740615. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
1 1 misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Tue 4:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule(s) D and Verification of Creditor List filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Cline Grain, Inc. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 01/17/2017. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due by 01/10/2017. Income & Expense Schedule due by 01/17/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due by 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule A/B with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule G with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule H with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 4:36 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-80004 JJG-11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26735115. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1