Member Case
Lead case is: 2:17-bk-80004

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 2:17-bk-80005
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cline Transport, Inc.
12161 N 650 E
Roachdale, IN 46172
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Hester
Hester Baker Krebs LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 03/24/2017 6:01 PM EDT
Friday, February 24, 2017
32 32 misc Small Business Statement in Lieu Fri 11:16 AM
Small Business Statement in Lieu of Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement and Statement of Operations filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
31 31 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 1:06 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Small Business Statement in Lieu Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 3/9/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-] 30
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
30 30 misc Small Business Statement in Lieu Wed 2:19 PM
Small Business Statement in Lieu of Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement and Statement of Operations filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Amended/Corrected Petition Wed 2:17 PM
Amended Voluntary Petition to reflect updated Small Business Status to yes, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1
28 28 order Order on Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest Wed 2:15 PM
Order Granting Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order . Proofs of Claim due by 5/17/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-] 27
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
27 27 motion Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest, Motion to Tue 10:11 AM
Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
26 26 misc Declaration Tue 9:38 AM
Declaration re: Schedule(s), Income & Expense Statement, Disclosure of Compensation, Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, January 30, 2017
25 25 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 10:58 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Schedule(s), Income & Expense Statement, Disclosure of Compensation, Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 2/13/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, January 27, 2017
24 24 misc Declaration Fri 3:37 PM
Schedule(s) A/B, C, E/F, G, H and Summary of Assets and Liabilities (no added creditors) (no added parties), Income & Expense Statement, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Declaration re: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
23 23 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Documents Wed 12:15 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Affairs Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. Incomplete Filings due by 2/2/2017. (jlh)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
22 22 motion Extend Time to File Initial Documents (Schedules, Plan, Pay Advices, Etc.), Motion to Tue 3:17 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Affairs filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
21 21 notice Appearance Fri 2:00 PM
Appearance filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Creditor Indiana Soybean Alliance, Inc. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice Fri 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 MEETING NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 22 Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
19 19 order Joint Administration, Order on Motion for Tue 10:36 AM
Order Granting Motion to Jointly Administer Member Case 2-17-bk-80005 under Lead Case 2:17-bk-80004 (order distributed to e-filers only). (lak)
Related: [-]
18 18 court 341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11 Tue 10:20 AM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 2/2/2017 at 01:00 PM EST in Rm 110 U.S. Courthouse, Terre Haute. Objections to Dischargeability due by 4/3/2017. (lad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
17 17 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 4:09 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims And Are Not Insiders filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Withdraw Document Mon 4:08 PM
Withdrawal of List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims And Are Not Insiders, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 3:46 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims And Are Not Insiders filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Minute Entry/Order Mon 2:37 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Hearing on Debtor's First Day Motion for Joint Administration. Hearing held. Court grants Debtor's Motion. Court to enter order Related [+]. (hhd)
Related: [-] 4
13 13 notice Appearance Mon 2:33 PM
Appearance filed by Gary A. Barnes on behalf of Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appearance Mon 11:26 AM
Appearance filed by James E. Carlberg on behalf of Creditor First Farmers Bank & Trust. (Carlberg, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Mon 10:41 AM
Appearance filed by Weston Erick Overturf on behalf of Creditor First Farmers Bank & Trust. (Overturf, Weston)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion for Joint Administration, Hearing Notice, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 4 ,7
Thursday, January 05, 2017
7 7 notice Hearing Notice (must be reviewed & approved by Court before filing) Thu 3:47 PM
Notice of Hearing re: Motion for Joint Administration, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Objections due by 01/09/2017. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 order Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Thu 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Attorney for Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company must distribute this order. (jlh)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear Wed 5:08 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Gary A. Barnes on behalf of Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Wed 4:21 PM
First Day Motion for Joint Administration of Cases 2:17-bk-80005, 2:17-bk-80004, 2:17-bk-80006, 1:17-bk-14 and 1:17-bk-13 filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Cline Transport, Inc. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Petition Wed 8:22 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued Related [+]. List of Equity Security Holders due by 01/17/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 7:36 AM
Appearance filed by Ronald J. Moore on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Moore, Ronald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 5:09 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-80005 JJG-11) [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26740691. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
1 1 misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Tue 4:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule(s) D and Verification of Creditor List filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Cline Transport, Inc. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 01/17/2017. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due by 01/10/2017. Income & Expense Schedule due by 01/17/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due by 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule A/B with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule G with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule H with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 4:42 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-80005 JJG-11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26735155. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1