Member Case
Lead case is: 2:17-bk-80004

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 2:17-bk-80006
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
New Winchester Properties. LLC
12161 N 650 E
Roachdale, IN 46172
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Hester
Hester Baker Krebs LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 03/28/2017 6:01 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
31 31 order Order on Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest Wed 3:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order . Proofs of Claim due by 5/17/2017. (lak)
Related: [-] 30
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
30 30 motion Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest, Motion to Tue 10:22 AM
Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
29 29 misc Declaration Tue 9:48 AM
Declaration re: Schedule(s), Income & Expense Statement, Disclosure of Compensation, List of Equity Security Holders, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 27
Monday, January 30, 2017
28 28 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 10:53 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Schedule(s), Income & Expense Statement, Disclosure of Compensation, List of Equity Security Holders, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 2/13/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, January 27, 2017
27 27 misc Disclosure of Compensation Fri 3:45 PM
Schedule(s) A/B, E/F, G, H and Summary of Assets and Liabilities (no added creditors) (no added parties), Income & Expense Statement, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, List of Equity Security Holders, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
26 26 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Documents Wed 12:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Affairs Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. Incomplete Filings due by 2/2/2017. (jlh)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
25 25 motion Extend Time to File Initial Documents (Schedules, Plan, Pay Advices, Etc.), Motion to Tue 3:14 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Affairs filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
24 24 notice Appearance Fri 2:01 PM
Appearance filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Creditor Indiana Soybean Alliance, Inc. (Moloy, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice Fri 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 MEETING NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 29 Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
22 22 notice Appearance Tue 11:49 AM
Appearance filed by W Randall Kammeyer on behalf of Creditor CNH Capital America, LLC. (Kammeyer, W)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Joint Administration, Order on Motion for Tue 10:37 AM
Order Granting Motion to Jointly Administer Member Case 2-17-bk-80006 under Lead Case 2:17-bk-80004 (order distributed to e-filers only). (lak)
Related: [-]
20 20 court 341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11 Tue 10:26 AM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 2/2/2017 at 01:00 PM EST in Rm 110 U.S. Courthouse, Terre Haute. Objections to Dischargeability due by 4/3/2017. (lad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
19 19 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 3:53 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims And Are Not Insiders filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Minute Entry/Order Mon 2:37 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Hearing on Debtor's First Day Motion for Joint Administration. Hearing held. Court grants Debtor's Motion. Court to enter order Related [+]. (hhd)
Related: [-] 8
17 17 notice Appearance Mon 2:31 PM
Appearance filed by Gary A. Barnes on behalf of Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Mon 11:25 AM
Appearance filed by James E. Carlberg on behalf of Creditor First Farmers Bank & Trust. (Carlberg, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Appearance Mon 10:43 AM
Appearance filed by Weston Erick Overturf on behalf of Creditor First Farmers Bank & Trust. (Overturf, Weston)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 08, 2017
14 14 notice Appearance Sun 2:49 PM
Appearance filed by Charles F. Miller Jr on behalf of Creditor Tri-County Bank & Trust Co. (Miller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion for Joint Administration, Hearing Notice, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC Related [+]. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 8 ,11
Thursday, January 05, 2017
11 11 notice Hearing Notice (must be reviewed & approved by Court before filing) Thu 4:06 PM
Notice of Hearing re: Motion for Joint Administration, filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/9/2017 at 10:30 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Objections due by 01/09/2017. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 order Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Thu 11:39 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Attorney for Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company must distribute this order. (jlh)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear Wed 5:03 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Gary A. Barnes on behalf of Creditor Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Wed 4:22 PM
First Day Motion for Joint Administration of Cases 2:17-bk-80006, 2:17-bk-80004, 2:17-bk-80005, 1:17-bk-14 and 1:17-bk-13 filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor New Winchester Properties. LLC. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 3:33 PM
Appearance filed by Scott R Leisz on behalf of Creditor Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Leisz, Scott)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 3:27 PM
Appearance filed by Whitney L Mosby on behalf of Creditor Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Mosby, Whitney)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 11:22 AM
Appearance filed by Elizabeth Marie Little on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Little, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Wed 10:41 AM
Appearance filed by Jay Jaffe on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Jaffe, Jay)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance Wed 10:35 AM
Appearance filed by Kayla D. Britton on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Britton, Kayla)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 7:37 AM
Appearance filed by Ronald J. Moore on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Moore, Ronald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 5:05 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-80006 JJG-11) [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26740679. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
1 1 misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Tue 4:45 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule(s) D and Verification of Creditor List filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of New Winchester Properties. LLC. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 01/17/2017. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due by 01/10/2017. Income & Expense Schedule due by 01/17/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due by 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule A/B with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule G with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. Schedule H with Declaration due by 01/17/2017. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 4:46 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-80006 JJG-11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26735191. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1