Equipment Direct, Inc.
Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Karen K Specie |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10002 |
Case Filed: | Jan 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Debtor
Equipment Direct, Inc.
PO Box 140366
Gainesville, FL 32614-0366 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
Docket last updated: 01/04/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 01/03 9:50 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Fee Amount Paid $335) filed by Equipment Direct, Inc. Schedule A/B due 01/17/2017. Schedule G due 01/17/2017. Schedule H due 01/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/17/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 01/17/2017. Employee Income Record or Statement of No Employee Income Due: 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017. (Cusumano, Barbara) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Online Payment
Tue 01/03 9:51 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-10002 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 3931316, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |