Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel S Oppermanflint
Case #: 4:17-bk-30003
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 02, 2017

Debtor
T & C Decorative Painting, LLC
3192 S Linden Rd Ste 112
Flint, MI 48507-3031
Represented By
James P. Frego, II
Frego & Assc.-The Bankruptcy Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Samuel D. Sweet
P.O. Box 757
Ortonville, MI 48462


Docket last updated: 01/04/2017 12:02 AM EST
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
crditcrd none Tue 1:02 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-30003 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 28790095, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 11:39 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy : Fee Amount $335. Filed by T & C Decorative Painting, LLC Section 316 Incomplete Filings Due: 02/17/2017. Credit Counseling Certificate Due: 01/17/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules Due 01/17/2017. Schedule A/B due 01/17/2017. Schedule D due 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F due 01/17/2017. Schedule G due 01/17/2017. Schedule H due 01/17/2017. Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017. (Frego, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Tue 11:40 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor T & C Decorative Painting, LLC. (Frego, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 11:40 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor T & C Decorative Painting, LLC. (Frego, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (b) Tue 12:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Samuel D. Sweet, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/02/2017 at 11:00 AM at Room G-19, 600 Church St., Flint 341. (admin, )
Related: [-]