Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jerry A Brown
Case #: 2:17-bk-10006
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 02, 2017

Debtor
GT Towing, Inc.
13184 Major Ln
Folsom, LA 70437-3716
Represented By
Louis R. Koerner, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Ronald J. Hof
9905 Jefferson Hwy.
River Ridge, LA 70123
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130


Docket last updated: 01/04/2017 12:03 AM CST
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Tue 8:20 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Ronald J. Hof, with 341(a)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 3:15 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by GT Towing, Inc.. Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing due by 01/10/2017. (Koerner, Louis)
Related: [-]