California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Maureen Tighe
Case #: 1:17-bk-10012
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Oligarch Capital LLC
10153 1/2 Riverside Dr # 189
Toluca Lake, CA 91602-2561
Represented By
George J Paukert
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
38 38 answer Objection Wed 4:49 PM
Objection Related [+] Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Avis Copelin in Support of Motion of Debtor in Possession for Authority to Use Case Collateral Filed by Creditor NPI Debt Fund I, LP (Nelson, Brian)
Related: [-] 33 Declaration filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC
37 37 answer Opposition Wed 4:46 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Secured Creditor's Oppositin to Notice of Motion and Motion of Debtor in Possession for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Creditor NPI Debt Fund I, LP (Nelson, Brian)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC
Saturday, February 11, 2017
36 36 misc Monthly Operating Report Sat 3:58 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: One. For the Month Ending Jan. 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2017
35 35 motion Employ (motion) Fri 3:49 PM
Application to Employ George J. Paukert as Reorganization Counsel Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Status report Fri 3:44 PM
Status report Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11),25 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF), 26 Hearing (Bk Other) Set,27 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document,28 Notice
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
33 33 misc Declaration Wed 2:54 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Avis Copelin in support of Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to Use Cash Collateral
32 32 court Hearing Set(Motion) Wed 8:31 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC
31 31 court Hearing Set(Motion) Wed 8:29 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 3/8/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 29 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor NPI Debt Fund I, LP
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
30 30 motion Use Cash Collateral (motion) Tue 4:29 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Relief - Real Property (motion) Tue 3:42 PM
Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 4545 Auckland Ave., Toluca Lake, CA 91602 . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor NPI Debt Fund I, LP (Nelson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Part 2
Att: 2 Appendix Part 3
Att: 3 Appendix Part 4
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 3:44 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property(1:17-bk-10012-MT) [motion,nmrp] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44186629. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#29
Saturday, February 04, 2017
28 28 notice Notice Sat 3:02 PM
Notice of Order Setting Scheduling and Cases Management Conference and Filing of Monthly Reports Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 25 Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference and Filing of Monthly Reports (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 2/1/2017
Friday, February 03, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/03/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
26 26 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 2:49 PM
Hearing Set25 Order Setting Status hearing to be held on 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Gonzalez, Emma)
Related: [-]
25 25 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 2:43 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference and Filing of Monthly Reports (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/1/2017 (Gonzalez, Emma)
Related: [-] doc
24 24 trustee Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (by Trustee/US Trustee - No PDF) Wed 2:22 PM
Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). 341(a) Meeting Continued to 2/1/2017 at 02:30 PM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (united states trustee (kcb))
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 8:09 PM
Notice of Hearing Continued 341 (a) Hearing Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
22 22 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Tue 1:39 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) re schedules and documents filed 1/16/17 and 1/17/17 Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
21 21 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 10:21 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without electronic /s/ or holographic signature and/or was not accompanied by the required Local Bankruptcy form Electronic Filing Declaration. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (Toomer, Rosalind)
Related: [-] 18 Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC
20 20 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) Tue 12:40 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Revised as to part 6, page 5 Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Tue 12:38 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Revised to include all documents Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Tue 12:18 AM
Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
17 17 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Tue 12:16 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
16 16 misc Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1) Tue 12:15 AM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
15 15 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 12:13 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
14 14 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Tue 12:10 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
13 13 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) Tue 12:08 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
12 12 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Tue 12:06 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
11 11 misc Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Tue 12:04 AM
Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 9:31 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 01. Receipt Number 10069329. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2017
10 10 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) Mon 11:58 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC Related [+]. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Friday, January 13, 2017
9 9 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 3:24 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Nelson, Brian. (Nelson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 08, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, January 06, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 10:29 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/31/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/3/2017. (Espino, Cecilia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
4 4 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Tue 10:24 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Tue 10:23 PM
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi Tue 10:21 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) Filed by Debtor Oligarch Capital LLC. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 10:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Oligarch Capital LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/17/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/17/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/17/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/17/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/17/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/17/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/17/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/17/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/17/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/17/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/17/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 01/17/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/17/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/17/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/17/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/17/2017. (Paukert, George)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 10:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:17-bk-10012) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43977033. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1