Haleh Ziaiematin v. Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00022 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2017 1:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haleh Ziaiematin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 03/06 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Haleh Ziaiematin. Dismissal is Without. (Golden, Stephen) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 02/27 5:49 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike LIS PENDENS DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS 15 filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Chavez, Ruby) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Strike
Mon 02/27 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike LIS PENDENS DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 3/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Chavez, Ruby) |
|
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 02/10 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Hyatt, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Joinder (Motion Related)
Fri 02/10 11:26 AM
JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 11 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attorney Robert A Hyatt added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA(pty:dft))(Hyatt, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 02/09 10:57 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 11 filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Chavez, Ruby) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 02/09 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 3/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Chavez, Ruby) |
|
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stipulation and Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Mon 01/09 11:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT7 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: SPS, Wells Fargo and Chase's deadline to plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued from January 10, 2017 to February 10, 2017. (ah) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 01/06 2:05 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 01/06 2:04 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) |
|
7 | 7
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 01/06 1:41 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Select Portfolio Servicing Inc answer now due 2/10/2017; Wells Fargo Bank NA answer now due 2/10/2017; JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA answer now due 2/10/2017, re Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Chavez, Ruby) |
|
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | ||
6 | 6
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Fri 01/06 8:29 AM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-00022 DSF(JEMx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 01/04 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 01/04 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 01/03 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC., (Chavez, Ruby) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 01/03 3:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC.. (Chavez, Ruby) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/03 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC640400 Receipt No: 0973-19133080 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC.. (Attorney Ruby J Chavez added to party SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Ruby J Chavez added to party WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC.(pty:dft))(Chavez, Ruby) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 01/04 2:42 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Corporation, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Haleh Ziaiematin. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL.] (et) |