Rocky Mountain Infrastructure, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10015
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10015
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10019 |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Rocky Mountain Infrastructure, LLC
410 17th St Ste 1400
Denver, CO 80202-4427 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 06/28 11:15 AM
Bankruptcy Case 17-10019 Closed (LMD) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Final Decree
Tue 06/27 1:24 PM
Order (I) Granting a Final Decree, (II) Terminating Noticing and Claims Services and (III) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 6/27/2017 (SJS) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 01/05 3:36 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An Order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Local Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Bonanza Creek Energy, Inc., Bonanza Creek Energy Operating Company, LLC, Bonanza Creek Energy Resources,LLC, Holmes Eastern Company, LLC, Rocky Mountain Infrastructure, LLC,Bonanza Creek Energy Upstream LLC and Bonanza Creek Energy Midstream,LLC. The docket in Case No. 17-10015 KJC) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 1/5/2017 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/04 12:12 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10019 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8292231, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion
Wed 01/04 11:11 AM
Motion for Joint Administration (Case No. 17-10019 Filed By Rocky Mountain Infrastructure, LLC (Collins, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 01/04 10:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Rocky Mountain Infrastructure, LLC) . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Rocky Mountain Infrastructure, LLC. (Collins, Mark) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 01/04 11:04 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (AK) |