California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:17-bk-10089
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Legal-Act Services, Inc. dba Discount Tire Centers
21010 Devonshire St
Chatsworth, CA 91311-2314
Represented By
Legal-Act Services, Inc. dba Discount Tire Centers
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
29 29 misc Notice of dismissal (BNC) Wed 5:35 PM
Notice of dismissal (BNC) (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF) Wed 5:35 PM
Order Dismissing Case - The Debtors Order to Show Cause Hearing Re: Dismissal, currently set for February8, 2017 is VACATED. Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 1/18/2017 Related [+]. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Legal-Act Services, Inc.,3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12, Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn), 12 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
27 27 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 10:40 AM
Notice of lodgment Order re Stay Relief (Action in non bktcy forum) w/ pos Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC Related [+]. (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Relief from Stay (action in a non bankruptcy forum) w/ pos . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC
26 26 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 10:38 AM
Notice of lodgment re Order re Stay relief U D Action w/ pos Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC Related [+]. (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Relief from Stay (U D Action) w/ pos . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
25 25 misc Memorandum of points and authorities Tue 4:42 PM
Memorandum of points and authorities re13 and15 Filed by Debtor Legal-Act Services, Inc. . (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 4:34 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Movant to lodge the order. The Court GRANTS relief from stay as set forth in the tentative ruling. Movantmay lodge an order as to relief from stay only. The tentative with regard to dismissal is VACATED. The court has previously set an Order To Show Cause re Dismissal for February 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. That hearing will go forward, unless the case is otherwise dismissed prior to the hearing based on failure to timely file certain petition-related documents. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC
23 23 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 4:34 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Movant to lodge the order. The Court GRANTS relief from stay as set forth in the tentative ruling. Movantmay lodge an order as to relief from stay only. The tentative with regard to dismissal is VACATED. The court has previously set an Order To Show Cause re Dismissal for February 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. That hearing will go forward, unless the case is otherwise dismissed prior to the hearing based on failure to timely file certain petition-related documents. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 9:31 PM
Receipt of Tape Duplication Fee - $31.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20215174. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 ORDER shortening time (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (BNC-PDF)
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 4:36 PM
Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF HEARING RE: STAY RELIEF MOTIONS; DECLARATION OF P M BRENT RE: NOTICE AND SERVICE Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC. (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Hearing Set(Motion) Wed 1:21 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC
18 18 court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 1:20 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC
17 17 order Shortening time (BNC-PDF) Wed 1:18 PM
Order Granting ORDER shortening time re Order Granting Applications And Setting Hearings On Shortened Notice (1) Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (unlawful detainer) [Doc. No. 13]; and (2) Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (Action in Non-bankruptcy Forum) [Doc. No. 15] (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/11/2017 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 14
16 16 motion Shortening time (motion) Wed 9:48 AM
Application shortening time re stay relief motion (action in non bankruptcy forum) w/ pos Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion X - Relief from Stay (Generic) (motion) Wed 9:45 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay (action in a non bankruptcy forum) w/ pos . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Shortening time (motion) Wed 9:38 AM
Application shortening time re: Stay Relief Motion (U D action) w/ pos Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion X - Relief from Stay (Generic) (motion) Wed 9:34 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay (U D Action) w/ pos . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Interested Party Baldwin Auto Center LLC (Brent, Paul)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 9:36 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(2:17-bk-10089-ER) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44020791. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#13
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 9:47 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(2:17-bk-10089-ER) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44020867. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#15
Monday, January 09, 2017
12 12 court Hearing Set(Motion) Mon 11:18 AM
Hearing Set re11 Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal re the Debtor filed the Petition without counsel. The Hearing date is set for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (BNC-PDF) Mon 11:16 AM
Order Granting Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case; hearing 2-8-17 at 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/9/2017 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, January 08, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) (BNC)
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, January 06, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Legal-Act Services, Inc.
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Legal-Act Services, Inc.
5 5 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice - Amended (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Fri 4:21 PM
Amended Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 1/18/2017. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Legal-Act Services, Inc.
4 4 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Fri 4:09 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) due 1-9-17. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 3:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/9/2017 at 01:30 PM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Thu 7:31 AM
Judge Ernest M. Robles added to case due to prior case 2:14-bk-20088-ER. Involvement of Judge Sheri Bluebond Terminated (Fleming, Lachelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 12:26 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Legal-Act Services, Inc. dba Discount Tire Centers List of Equity Security Holders due 1/18/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/18/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/18/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/18/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/18/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/18/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/18/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/18/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/18/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/18/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/18/2017. (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Thu 9:46 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00 by 22. Receipt Number 10069255. (admin)
Related: [-]
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Fri 4:16 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 1/18/2017. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Legal-Act Services, Inc.