Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel S Oppermanflint
Case #: 4:17-bk-30023
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017
Claims Deadline:May 08, 2017

Debtor
Flint Eagles Motorcycle Club MC
PO Box 5055
Flint, MI 48505-0055
Represented By
Flint Eagles Motorcycle Club MC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Collene K. Corcoran
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371


Docket last updated: 01/05/2017 12:02 AM EST
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
court Flags Set CASECHECKED Wed 2:44 PM
Flags Set CASECHECKED. (smk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 1:49 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy : Receipt Number Install, Fee Amount $0.00. Filed by Flint Eagles Motorcycle Club MC Section 316 Incomplete Filings Due: 2/21/2017. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors due 1/18/2017. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Debtor(s) without an Attorney due 1/18/2017. Schedule A/B due 1/18/2017. Schedule D due 1/18/2017. Schedule E/F due 1/18/2017. Schedule G due 1/18/2017. Schedule H due 1/18/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/18/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/18/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/18/2017. (smk)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (ba) Wed 1:51 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 11:00 AM at Room G-19, 600 Church St., Flint 341. Proof of Claim due by 05/08/2017. (smk)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pay Filing Fee in Installments Wed 1:51 PM
Application for Individuals to Pay the Filing Fee in Installments Filed by Debtor Flint Eagles Motorcycle Club MC (smk)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Pro Se Filing Information Form Wed 1:53 PM
Pro Se Filing Information Form has been submitted by Debtor(s) Flint Eagles Motorcycle Club MC . (smk)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Wed 1:55 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Acceptable List of Creditors Missing, Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Missing or Non-Compliant, and Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Acceptable List of Creditors due on 1/11/2017. Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Missing or Non-Compliant due on 1/11/2017. Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 1/11/2017. (smk)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice of Missing Documents Wed 2:38 PM
Notice of Missing Documents Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition (Business Only) Due on 1/18/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/18/2017. (smk)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order) Wed 4:07 PM
Order Denying Application To Pay Filing Fee In Installments. Related [+] Filing Fees Due 2/18/2017. (kcm)
Related: [-] 3