Franklin Auto Transport Inc.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Joan N Feeney |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10025 |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Debtor
Franklin Auto Transport Inc.
9 Parkway Rd
Stoneham, MA 02180-2820 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
Joseph G. Butler
Law Office of Joseph G. Butler 355 Providence Highway
Westwood, MA 02090 |
Docket last updated: 01/05/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b (Use for AutoAssign Only)
Wed 01/04 10:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors is scheduled on 02/09/2017 at 09:30 AM at Room 325-B, U.S. Trustee Office, J.W. McCormack Post Office & Court House. (Spirn, Joshua) |
||
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/04 10:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-10025 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 16038346, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 01/04 10:56 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by Franklin Auto Transport Inc.. (Spirn, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Wed 01/04 10:56 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor Franklin Auto Transport Inc. (Spirn, Joshua) |