Smith v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William S Duffey, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00037 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2017 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wright Medical Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John T. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/26 11:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Ash, Dana) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/16 12:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING 2375 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Terrence Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT et al.(jkl) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/26 12:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) |
||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
12
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/26 12:17 PM
OPINION AND ORDER directing that the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached to this Order, be transferred out of this MDL and remanded to the United States District Courts in which they were originally filed and from which they were transferred to the Court. The Clerk is directed to transfer the cases listed in Exhibit A to their respective District Courts. It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to administratively close all cases listed in Exhibit B. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/30 4:19 PM
NOTICE by John T. Smith Service of Plaintiff Fact Sheet (Mathews, D.) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/27 3:33 PM
SHORT FORM ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of John T. Smith by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/26/2017.(Ash, Dana) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/26 11:11 AM
NOTICE by John T. Smith Service of Preliminary Disclosure Form (Mathews, D.) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 01/12 10:56 AM
Return of Service Executed by John T. Smith. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 1/10/2017, answer due 1/31/2017. (Mathews, D.) |
|
7 | 7
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 01/12 10:55 AM
Return of Service Executed by John T. Smith. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 1/10/2017, answer due 1/31/2017. (Mathews, D.) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 01/06 10:05 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(ddm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/05 11:32 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by John T. Smith Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Mathews, D.) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/05 11:31 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by John T. Smith Wright Medical Group, Inc. (Mathews, D.) |
|
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 01/05 11:14 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. (ddm) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/04 3:57 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by John T. Smith (Mathews, D.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/04 2:13 PM
ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by John T. Smith. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6896352.)(ddm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |